UT HB0080 | 2021 | General Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-02-26 - House/ placed on Concurrence Calendar in House Concurrence Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Data Security Amendments

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Data Security Amendments

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-25 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - Senate - Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 1 to # 2 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-12 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - House - House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-26HouseHouse/ placed on Concurrence Calendar in House Concurrence Calendar
2021-02-26HouseHouse/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House
2021-02-25HouseSenate/ to House with amendments in Clerk of the House
2021-02-25HouseSenate/ passed 3rd reading in Clerk of the House
2021-02-25SenateSenate/ 3rd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar
2021-02-24SenateSenate/ passed 2nd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar
2021-02-24SenateSenate/ uncircled in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2021-02-24SenateSenate/ circled in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2021-02-24SenateSenate/ 2nd reading in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2021-02-20SenateLFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2021-02-19SenateSenate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2021-02-19SenateSenate/ comm rpt/ substituted in Senate Judiciary, Law Enforcement, and Criminal Justice Committee
2021-02-19SenateSenate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Judiciary, Law Enforcement, and Criminal Justice Committee
2021-02-19SenateSenate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 1 to # 2 in Senate Judiciary, Law Enforcement, and Criminal Justice Committee
2021-02-17SenateSenate/ to standing committee in Senate Judiciary, Law Enforcement, and Criminal Justice Committee
2021-02-16SenateSenate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee
2021-02-16SenateSenate/ received from House in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate
2021-02-12SenateHouse/ to Senate in Senate Secretary
2021-02-12SenateHouse/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary
2021-02-12HouseHouse/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2021-02-09HouseHouse/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2021-02-09HouseHouse/ comm rpt/ substituted in House Business and Labor Committee
2021-02-08HouseHouse Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Business and Labor Committee
2021-02-08HouseHouse Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 in House Business and Labor Committee
2021-01-20HouseHouse/ to standing committee in House Business and Labor Committee
2021-01-19HouseHouse/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee
2021-01-19HouseHouse/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Clerk of the House
2021-01-06HouseHouse/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House
2020-12-30 Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel
2020-12-30 Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel

Subjects


Utah State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://le.utah.gov/~2021/bills/static/HB0080.html
Texthttp://le.utah.gov/~2021/bills/hbillint/HB0080.pdf
Texthttp://le.utah.gov/~2021/bills/hbillint/HB0080S01.pdf
Texthttp://le.utah.gov/~2021/bills/hbillint/HB0080S02.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2021/HB0080.fn.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2021/HB0080.pna.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/~2021/bills/hbillint/HB0080S01_ComparedWith_HB0080.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2021/HB0080S01.pna.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2021/HB0080S01.fn.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/~2021/bills/hbillint/HB0080S02_ComparedWith_HB0080S01.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2021/HB0080S02.fn.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2021/HB0080S02.pna.pdf
Roll Callhttps://le.utah.gov/mtgvotes.jsp?voteid=19243
Roll Callhttps://le.utah.gov/mtgvotes.jsp?voteid=19244
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?sessionid=2021GS&voteid=406&house=H
Roll Callhttps://le.utah.gov/mtgvotes.jsp?voteid=19953
Roll Callhttps://le.utah.gov/mtgvotes.jsp?voteid=19954
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?sessionid=2021GS&voteid=938&house=S
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?sessionid=2021GS&voteid=989&house=S

Bill Comments

feedback