UT HB0080 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-18 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-18 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Vehicle Impound Amendments
Title
Vehicle Impound Amendments
Sponsors
Rep. Fred Cox [R] | Sen. Mark Madsen [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-02-18 - House - House/ failed (Y: 29 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2016-02-03 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-03 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-18 | House | House/ filed in House file for bills not passed |
2016-02-18 | House/ failed in Clerk of the House | |
2016-02-18 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2016-02-04 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2016-02-04 | House | House/ committee report favorable in House Transportation Committee |
2016-02-03 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Transportation Committee |
2016-02-02 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Transportation Committee |
2016-01-25 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2016-01-13 | House/ received bill from Legislative Printing in Clerk of the House | |
2016-01-05 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2015-12-22 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2015-12-22 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2015-12-21 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |