UT HB0080 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-22 - House/ failed in HFILE
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Public Access to Private Stream Beds

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Access to Private Stream Beds

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2010-02-12 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-02-22 House/ failed in HFILE
2010-02-22 House/ 3rd reading in H3RDHB
2010-02-16 House/ comm rpt/ amended in HSTJUD
2010-02-12 House Comm - Amendment Recommendation in HSTJUD
2010-01-26 House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print in HSTRUL
2010-01-25 LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in HSTRUL
2010-01-25 House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL
2010-01-07 LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC
2010-01-07 Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC

Subjects


Utah State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback