UT HB0079 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-01-28 - House/ filed in HFILE
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Valid Voter Identification Amendments

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Valid Voter Identification Amendments

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2010-01-26 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-01-28 House/ filed in HFILE
2010-01-28 House/ 3rd reading in H3RDHB
2010-01-26 House/ committee report favorable in HSTGOC
2010-01-25 House/ to standing committee in HSTGOC
2010-01-19 House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print in HDOCKET
2010-01-06 House/ to Printing with fiscal note in LRGC
2010-01-06 LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in LRGC
2010-01-06 Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC
2009-11-19 LFA/ bill assigned to staff for fiscal analysis in LRGC

Subjects


Utah State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback