UT HB0078 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-29 - Senate/ substituted in SSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-29 - Senate/ substituted in SSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Utah Division of Consumer Protection Amendments
Title
Utah Division of Consumer Protection Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-29 - Senate - Senate/ substituted (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - Senate - Senate/ uncircled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - Senate - Senate/ circled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-22 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2012-02-15 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-02-01 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2012-02-29 - Senate - Senate/ uncircled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - Senate - Senate/ circled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-22 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2012-02-15 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-02-01 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-29 | Senate/ substituted in SSUB | |
2012-02-29 | Senate/ uncircled in S2ND | |
2012-02-23 | Senate/ circled in S2ND | |
2012-02-23 | Senate/ 2nd reading in S2ND | |
2012-02-22 | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in S2ND | |
2012-02-22 | Senate/ committee report favorable in SSTBUS | |
2012-02-22 | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in SSTBUS | |
2012-02-16 | Senate/ to standing committee in SSTBUS | |
2012-02-16 | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL | |
2012-02-15 | Senate/ received from House in SINTRO | |
2012-02-15 | House/ to Senate in SSEC | |
2012-02-15 | House/ passed 3rd reading in SSEC | |
2012-02-15 | House/ 3rd reading in H3RDHB | |
2012-02-01 | House/ 2nd reading in H3RDHB | |
2012-02-01 | House/ comm rpt/ amended in HSTWED | |
2012-02-01 | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in HSTWED | |
2012-02-01 | House Comm - Amendment Recommendation in HSTWED | |
2012-01-26 | House/ to standing committee in HSTWED | |
2012-01-25 | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in HSTRUL | |
2012-01-24 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in HSTRUL | |
2012-01-24 | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in HSTRUL | |
2012-01-23 | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL | |
2012-01-23 | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in HCLERK | |
2012-01-20 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2012-01-20 | Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi in LRGC | |
2012-01-20 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |