UT HB0076 | 2021 | General Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-02-24 - LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Firearm Preemption Amendments

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Firearm Preemption Amendments

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-23 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 56 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - House - House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - House - House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - House - House Comm - Reconsider actions (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - House - House Comm - Held (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-24SenateLFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Senate Rules Committee
2021-02-24SenateLFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in Senate Rules Committee
2021-02-24SenateSenate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee
2021-02-24SenateSenate/ received from House in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate
2021-02-23SenateHouse/ to Senate in Senate Secretary
2021-02-23SenateHouse/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary
2021-02-23HouseHouse/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2021-02-22HouseHouse/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2021-02-22HouseHouse/ comm rpt/ substituted/ amended in House Judiciary Committee
2021-02-22HouseHouse Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Judiciary Committee
2021-02-22HouseHouse Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 in House Judiciary Committee
2021-02-22HouseHouse Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 in House Judiciary Committee
2021-02-22HouseHouse Comm - Reconsider actions in House Judiciary Committee
2021-02-22HouseHouse Comm - Held in House Judiciary Committee
2021-02-17HouseHouse/ to standing committee in House Judiciary Committee
2021-01-19HouseHouse/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee
2021-01-06HouseHouse/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House
2020-12-30 Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel
2020-12-30 Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
63G7301Amended CodeSee Bill Text
7610500Amended CodeSee Bill Text
7610501Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Utah State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://le.utah.gov/~2021/bills/static/HB0076.html
Texthttp://le.utah.gov/~2021/bills/hbillint/HB0076.pdf
Texthttp://le.utah.gov/~2021/bills/hbillint/HB0076S01.pdf
Texthttp://le.utah.gov/~2021/bills/hbillamd/HB0076S01.pdf
Amendmenthttp://le.utah.gov/~2021/pamend/hb0076s01.hca.01.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2021/HB0076.fn.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2021/HB0076.pna.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/~2021/bills/hbillint/HB0076S02_ComparedWith_HB0076S01.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/~2021/bills/hbillint/HB0076S01_ComparedWith_HB0076.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2021/HB0076S02.pna.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2021/HB0076S01.pna.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2021/HB0076S02.fn.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2021/HB0076S01.fn.pdf
Roll Callhttps://le.utah.gov/mtgvotes.jsp?voteid=20007
Roll Callhttps://le.utah.gov/mtgvotes.jsp?voteid=20030
Roll Callhttps://le.utah.gov/mtgvotes.jsp?voteid=20032
Roll Callhttps://le.utah.gov/mtgvotes.jsp?voteid=20036
Roll Callhttps://le.utah.gov/mtgvotes.jsp?voteid=20037
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?sessionid=2021GS&voteid=681&house=H

Bill Comments

feedback