UT HB0070 | 2021 | General Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-03-03 - House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Ballot Tracking Amendments

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Ballot Tracking Amendments

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - House - House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-03 House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling
2021-03-03HouseHouse/ received from Senate in House Speaker
2021-03-03HouseSenate/ to House in House Speaker
2021-03-03HouseSenate/ signed by President/ returned to House in House Speaker
2021-03-03SenateSenate/ passed 3rd reading in Senate President
2021-03-03SenateSenate/ 3rd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar
2021-03-03SenateSenate/ placed back on 3rd Reading Calendar in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar
2021-02-25SenateSenate/ placed on 3rd Reading Calendar table in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar Table
2021-02-25SenateSenate/ passed 2nd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar
2021-02-25SenateSenate/ 2nd reading in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2021-02-22SenateSenate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2021-02-22SenateSenate/ committee report favorable in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee
2021-02-22SenateSenate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee
2021-02-18SenateSenate/ to standing committee in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee
2021-02-02SenateSenate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee
2021-02-02SenateSenate/ received from House in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate
2021-02-02SenateHouse/ to Senate in Senate Secretary
2021-02-02SenateHouse/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary
2021-02-02HouseHouse/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2021-01-26HouseHouse/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2021-01-26HouseHouse/ comm rpt/ substituted in House Government Operations Committee
2021-01-25HouseHouse Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Government Operations Committee
2021-01-25HouseHouse Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 in House Government Operations Committee
2021-01-25HouseHouse/ to Printing with fiscal note in House Government Operations Committee
2021-01-25HouseLFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in House Government Operations Committee
2021-01-20HouseHouse/ to standing committee in House Government Operations Committee
2021-01-19HouseHouse/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee
2021-01-19HouseHouse/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Clerk of the House
2021-01-06HouseHouse/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House
2020-12-29 Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel
2020-12-29 Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
20A16501Amended CodeSee Bill Text
20A2104Amended CodeSee Bill Text
20A2108Amended CodeSee Bill Text
20A2304Amended CodeSee Bill Text
20A2306Amended CodeSee Bill Text
20A6105Amended CodeSee Bill Text
20A7801Amended CodeSee Bill Text
63G2302Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Utah State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://le.utah.gov/~2021/bills/static/HB0070.html
Texthttp://le.utah.gov/~2021/bills/hbillint/HB0070.pdf
Texthttp://le.utah.gov/~2021/bills/hbillint/HB0070S01.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2021/HB0070.fn.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2021/HB0070.pna.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2021/HB0070S01.fn.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/~2021/bills/hbillint/HB0070S01_ComparedWith_HB0070.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2021/HB0070S01.pna.pdf
Roll Callhttps://le.utah.gov/mtgvotes.jsp?voteid=18517
Roll Callhttps://le.utah.gov/mtgvotes.jsp?voteid=18518
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?sessionid=2021GS&voteid=162&house=H
Roll Callhttps://le.utah.gov/mtgvotes.jsp?voteid=19997
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?sessionid=2021GS&voteid=992&house=S
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?sessionid=2021GS&voteid=1262&house=S

Bill Comments

feedback