UT HB0069 | 2013 | Regular Session
Note: Legislation replaced by HB0069S01
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-01 - House/ comm rpt/ substituted in HSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-01 - House/ comm rpt/ substituted in HSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expungement of Records
Title
Expungement of Records
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-01 | House | House/ comm rpt/ substituted in HSUB |
2013-01-31 | House | House Comm - Substitute Recommendation in HSTLAW |
2013-01-29 | House | House/ to standing committee in HSTLAW |
2013-01-28 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL |
2013-01-25 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in HCLERK |
2013-01-23 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in HCLERK |
2013-01-23 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in LRGC | |
2013-01-23 | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in LRGC | |
2013-01-16 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2013-01-16 | Numbered Bill Publically Distributed in LRGC | |
2013-01-16 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |
Same As/Similar To
HB0069S01 (Replaced by) 2013-02-14 - Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted/ Consent Calendar in SSUB
Subjects
Utah State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://le.utah.gov/~2013/htmdoc/hbillhtm/HB0069.htm |
Text | https://le.utah.gov/~2013/bills/hbillint/hb0069.pdf |