UT HB0064 | 2022 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-04 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-04 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Drinking Water Amendments
Title
Drinking Water Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-16 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 73 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - House - House Comm - Refer to Committee (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - House - House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 1 to # 2 (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-19 - House - House Comm - Held (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-19 - House - House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 73 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - House - House Comm - Refer to Committee (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - House - House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 1 to # 2 (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-19 - House - House Comm - Held (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-19 - House - House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-04 | House | House/ filed in House file for bills not passed |
2022-03-04 | House | House/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House |
2022-03-04 | House | Senate/ to House in Clerk of the House |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Senate/ strike enacting clause in Senate Secretary |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Senate/ to Rules in Senate Rules Committee |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 3rd Reading Calendar table in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar Table |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Senate/ passed 2nd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd reading in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Senate/ committee report favorable in Senate Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Environment Committee |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Environment Committee |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Environment Committee |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2022-02-07 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate Secretary |
2022-02-07 | Senate | House/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary |
2022-02-07 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2022-02-01 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2022-01-31 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Environment Committee |
2022-01-28 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Environment Committee |
2022-01-28 | House | House/ comm rpt/ substituted in House Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2022-01-27 | House | House Comm - Refer to Committee in House Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2022-01-27 | House | House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 1 to # 2 in House Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2022-01-26 | House | House/ to Printing with fiscal note in House Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2022-01-25 | House | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in House Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2022-01-19 | House | House Comm - Held in House Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2022-01-19 | House | House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 in House Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2022-01-18 | House | House/ to Printing with fiscal note in House Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2022-01-18 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2022-01-18 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2022-01-18 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Clerk of the House |
2022-01-12 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2021-12-20 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2021-12-20 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Department of Environmental Quality
Drinking Water
Environment
Government Operations (State Issues)
Natural Resources
Public Funds and Accounts
Water
Water Company
Water Utilities, Irrigation, and Sewer
Drinking Water
Environment
Government Operations (State Issues)
Natural Resources
Public Funds and Accounts
Water
Water Company
Water Utilities, Irrigation, and Sewer