UT HB0061 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 1 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-01 - Governor Signed in LTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Clean Air Programs

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Clean Air Programs

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-03-13 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee - Final Passage (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - Senate - Senate Motion to Adopt Joint Conference Comm Rpt (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - House - House Conference Committee - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - House - House Motion to Adopt Joint Conference Comm Rpt (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - Senate - Senate/ refused to recede from Senate amendments (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - House - House/ refuse to concur with Senate amendment (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - Senate - Senate/ floor amendment (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-06 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2014-02-26 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 72 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-04-01 Governor Signed in LTGOV
2014-03-21 House/ to Governor in EGOV
2014-03-20HouseHouse/ enrolled bill to Printing in HCLERK
2014-03-20HouseEnrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in HCLERK
2014-03-18 Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in LRGCEN
2014-03-16 Bill Received from House for Enrolling in LRGCEN
2014-03-13 House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling in LRGCEN
2014-03-13HouseHouse/ received from Senate in HSPKR
2014-03-13 Senate/ to House in CONCOM
2014-03-13HouseSenate/ signed by President/ returned to House in HSPKR
2014-03-13 Senate Conference Committee - Final Passage in CONCOM
2014-03-13 Senate Motion to Adopt Joint Conference Comm Rpt in CONCOM
2014-03-13 Senate/ received from House in CONCOM
2014-03-13SenateHouse/ to Senate in SPRES
2014-03-13SenateHouse Conference Committee - Final Passage in SPRES
2014-03-13 House Motion to Adopt Joint Conference Comm Rpt in CONCOM
2014-03-13 House/ received from Senate in CONCOM
2014-03-13 House/ to Senate in CONCOM
2014-03-13 House Conference Committee Appointed in CONCOM
2014-03-13 House/ received from Senate in CONCOM
2014-03-13 Senate/ to House in CONCOM
2014-03-13 Senate Conference Committee Appointed in CONCOM
2014-03-13SenateSenate/ refused to recede from Senate amendments in SSEC
2014-03-13SenateHouse/ to Senate in SSEC
2014-03-13SenateHouse/ refuse to concur with Senate amendment in SSEC
2014-03-13HouseHouse/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in HCURCAL
2014-03-12HouseLFA/ fiscal note publicly available in HCURCAL
2014-03-12HouseLFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in HCURCAL
2014-03-12HouseHouse/ placed on Concurrence Calendar in HCURCAL
2014-03-12HouseHouse/ received from Senate in HCLERK
2014-03-12HouseSenate/ to House with amendments in HCLERK
2014-03-12HouseSenate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in HCLERK
2014-03-12SenateSenate/ floor amendment in S2ND
2014-03-12SenateSenate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in S2ND
2014-03-12SenateSenate/ Rules to 2nd Reading Calendar in S2ND
2014-03-10SenateSenate/ 2nd Reading Calendar to Rules in SSTRUL
2014-03-07SenateSenate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in S2ND
2014-03-07SenateSenate/ committee report favorable in SSTNAE
2014-03-06SenateSenate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in SSTNAE
2014-03-03SenateSenate Comm - Not Considered in SSTNAE
2014-02-27SenateSenate/ to standing committee in SSTNAE
2014-02-27SenateSenate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL
2014-02-27SenateSenate/ received from House in SINTRO
2014-02-26SenateHouse/ to Senate in SSEC
2014-02-26SenateHouse/ passed 3rd reading in SSEC
2014-02-26HouseHouse/ 3rd reading in H3RDHB
2014-02-14HouseHouse/ 2nd reading in H3RDHB
2014-02-14HouseHouse/ committee report favorable in HSTNAE
2014-02-13HouseHouse Comm - Favorable Recommendation in HSTNAE
2014-02-11HouseHouse/ to standing committee in HSTNAE
2014-01-27HouseHouse/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL
2014-01-24HouseHouse/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in HCLERK
2014-01-22HouseHouse/ received bill from Legislative Research in HCLERK
2014-01-17 Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in LRGC
2014-01-17 Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC
2013-11-20 LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC
2013-11-20 LFA/ bill assigned to staff for fiscal analysis in LRGC

Subjects


Utah State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://le.utah.gov/~2014/htmdoc/hbillhtm/HB0061.htm
Texthttp://le.utah.gov/~2014/bills/hbillint/hb0061.pdf
Texthttp://le.utah.gov/~2014/bills/hbillamd/hb0061.pdf
Texthttp://le.utah.gov/~2014/bills/hbillenr/hb0061.pdf
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/asp/votes/comvotes.asp?sessionid=2014GS&voteid=3146&sequence=7785
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?voteid=428&house=H&sessionid=2014GS
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/asp/votes/comvotes.asp?sessionid=2014GS&voteid=3783&sequence=20479
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?voteid=1429&house=S&sessionid=2014GS
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?voteid=1430&house=S&sessionid=2014GS
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?voteid=1109&house=H&sessionid=2014GS
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?voteid=1533&house=S&sessionid=2014GS
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?voteid=1168&house=H&sessionid=2014GS
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?voteid=1169&house=H&sessionid=2014GS
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?voteid=1603&house=S&sessionid=2014GS
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?voteid=1604&house=S&sessionid=2014GS

Bill Comments

feedback