UT HB0059 | 2022 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-04 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-04 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Rape Crisis Center Amendments
Title
Rape Crisis Center Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-25 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-01-21 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-01-21 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-04 | House | House/ filed in House file for bills not passed |
2022-03-04 | House | House/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House |
2022-03-04 | House | Senate/ to House in Clerk of the House |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Senate/ strike enacting clause in Senate Secretary |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Senate/ Rules to 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd Reading Calendar to Rules in Senate Rules Committee |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Senate/ committee report favorable in Senate Business and Labor Committee |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Business and Labor Committee |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Business and Labor Committee |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2022-01-26 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Senate Secretary |
2022-01-26 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate Secretary |
2022-01-26 | Senate | House/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary |
2022-01-26 | House | House/ substituted from # 0 to # 1 in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2022-01-26 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2022-01-24 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2022-01-24 | House | House/ committee report favorable in House Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice Committee |
2022-01-21 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice Committee |
2022-01-19 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice Committee |
2022-01-18 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2022-01-12 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Clerk of the House |
2022-01-12 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2021-12-20 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2021-12-20 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Crimes
Domestic Violence
Human Services
Judicial Operations
Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice
Public Safety
Sexual Offenses
Victims
Domestic Violence
Human Services
Judicial Operations
Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice
Public Safety
Sexual Offenses
Victims
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
76 | 5 | 606 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
77 | 38 | 203 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
77 | 38 | 204 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |