UT HB0057 | 2022 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-04 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-04 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Government Records Access Amendments
Title
Government Records Access Amendments
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-04 | House | House/ filed in House file for bills not passed |
2022-03-04 | House | House/ strike enacting clause in Clerk of the House |
2022-01-18 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2022-01-12 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Clerk of the House |
2022-01-12 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2022-01-10 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2021-12-20 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2021-12-20 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2021-12-20 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Archives and Records
Electronic Information
Government Operations (State Issues)
Government Records
State Officers and Employees
Technology
Electronic Information
Government Operations (State Issues)
Government Records
State Officers and Employees
Technology