UT HB0056 | 2023 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-23 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-23 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Tax Assessment Amendments
Title
Tax Assessment Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-01 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-02-10 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-02-03 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - House - House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-02-10 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-02-03 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - House - House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-23 | Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing | |
2023-03-13 | House/ to Governor in Executive Branch - Governor | |
2023-03-13 | House | House/ received enrolled bill from Printing in Clerk of the House |
2023-03-09 | House | House/ enrolled bill to Printing in Clerk of the House |
2023-03-09 | House | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in Clerk of the House |
2023-03-02 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2023-03-02 | Bill Received from House for Enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2023-03-01 | House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2023-03-01 | House | House/ received from Senate in House Speaker |
2023-03-01 | House | Senate/ to House in House Speaker |
2023-03-01 | House | Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House in House Speaker |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Senate/ passed 3rd reading in Senate President |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Senate/ 3rd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Senate/ placed back on 3rd Reading Calendar in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 3rd Reading Calendar table in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar Table |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Senate/ passed 2nd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd reading in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Senate/ committee report favorable in Senate Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2023-02-10 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2023-02-03 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate Secretary |
2023-02-03 | Senate | House/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary |
2023-02-03 | House | House/ floor amendment # 1 in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2023-02-03 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2023-02-01 | House | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2023-02-01 | House | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2023-02-01 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2023-02-01 | House | House/ comm rpt/ substituted in House Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2023-01-31 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2023-01-31 | House | House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 in House Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2023-01-17 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2023-01-17 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2023-01-17 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Clerk of the House |
2023-01-04 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2022-12-21 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2022-12-20 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Assessment and Equalization
County and Municipal Finance
Local Taxation and Fees
Political Subdivisions (Local Issues)
Property Tax
Revenue and Taxation
State Tax Commission
County and Municipal Finance
Local Taxation and Fees
Political Subdivisions (Local Issues)
Property Tax
Revenue and Taxation
State Tax Commission
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
59 | 10 | 1045 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 10 | 114 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 10 | 1402 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 10 | 1403 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 10 | 406 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |