UT HB0054 | 2022 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-04 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-04 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Enterprise Zone Tax Credit Amendments
Title
Enterprise Zone Tax Credit Amendments
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-04 | House | House/ filed in House file for bills not passed |
2022-03-04 | House | House/ strike enacting clause in Clerk of the House |
2022-03-02 | House | House/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules in House Rules Committee |
2022-02-28 | House | House Comm - Returned to Rules in House Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2022-02-04 | House | House Comm - Not Considered in House Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2022-02-03 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2022-01-18 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2022-01-18 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Clerk of the House |
2022-01-14 | House | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Clerk of the House |
2022-01-12 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2022-01-12 | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2021-12-20 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2021-12-20 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2021-12-20 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Corporate Tax
Energy
Gross Receipts
Income Tax
Individual Income Tax
Legislative Operations
Revenue and Taxation
Sunsets and Repealers
Tax Credits
Energy
Gross Receipts
Income Tax
Individual Income Tax
Legislative Operations
Revenue and Taxation
Sunsets and Repealers
Tax Credits
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
59 | 10 | 1037 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 7 | 614 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
63I | 2 | 263 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
63N | 2 | 213 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |