UT HB0054 | 2021 | General Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-02-26 - Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Insurance Revisions

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Insurance Revisions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-26 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-26 - Senate - Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 1 to # 2 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-26SenateSenate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2021-02-26SenateSenate/ comm rpt/ substituted in Senate Business and Labor Committee
2021-02-26SenateSenate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Business and Labor Committee
2021-02-26SenateSenate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 1 to # 2 in Senate Business and Labor Committee
2021-02-24SenateSenate/ to standing committee in Senate Business and Labor Committee
2021-02-17SenateSenate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee
2021-02-17SenateSenate/ received from House in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate
2021-02-17SenateHouse/ to Senate in Senate Secretary
2021-02-17SenateHouse/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary
2021-02-17HouseHouse/ uncircled in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2021-02-16HouseHouse/ circled in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2021-02-16HouseHouse/ substituted from # 0 to # 1 in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2021-02-16HouseHouse/ uncircled in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2021-01-21HouseHouse/ circled in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2021-01-21HouseHouse/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2021-01-19HouseHouse/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2021-01-19HouseHouse/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2021-01-19HouseHouse/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee
2021-01-06HouseHouse/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Clerk of the House
2021-01-06HouseHouse/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House
2020-12-21 Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel
2020-12-21 Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
31A1103Amended CodeSee Bill Text
31A1301Amended CodeSee Bill Text
31A17404Amended CodeSee Bill Text
31A21101Amended CodeSee Bill Text
31A21201Amended CodeSee Bill Text
31A21402Amended CodeSee Bill Text
31A21404Amended CodeSee Bill Text
31A221404Amended CodeSee Bill Text
31A222002Amended CodeSee Bill Text
31A22409Amended CodeSee Bill Text
31A22501Amended CodeSee Bill Text
31A22504Amended CodeSee Bill Text
31A22505Amended CodeSee Bill Text
31A22517Amended CodeSee Bill Text
31A22522Amended CodeSee Bill Text
31A22600Amended CodeSee Bill Text
31A22602Amended CodeSee Bill Text
31A22607Amended CodeSee Bill Text
31A22608Amended CodeSee Bill Text
31A22612Amended CodeSee Bill Text
31A22618Amended CodeSee Bill Text
31A22627Amended CodeSee Bill Text
31A22654Amended CodeSee Bill Text
31A22701Amended CodeSee Bill Text
31A22716Amended CodeSee Bill Text
31A22717Amended CodeSee Bill Text
31A26102Amended CodeSee Bill Text
31A28103Amended CodeSee Bill Text
31A35404Amended CodeSee Bill Text
31A35406Amended CodeSee Bill Text
31A37102Amended CodeSee Bill Text
31A37202Amended CodeSee Bill Text
31A37204Amended CodeSee Bill Text
31A37303Amended CodeSee Bill Text
31A37701Amended CodeSee Bill Text
31A45501Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Utah State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://le.utah.gov/~2021/bills/static/HB0054.html
Texthttp://le.utah.gov/~2021/bills/hbillint/HB0054.pdf
Texthttp://le.utah.gov/~2021/bills/hbillint/HB0054S01.pdf
Texthttp://le.utah.gov/~2021/bills/hbillint/HB0054S02.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2021/HB0054.fn.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2021/HB0054.pna.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/~2021/bills/hbillint/HB0054S01_ComparedWith_HB0054.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2021/HB0054S01.pna.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2021/HB0054S01.fn.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/~2021/bills/hbillint/HB0054S02_ComparedWith_HB0054S01.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2021/HB0054S02.pna.pdf
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?sessionid=2021GS&voteid=489&house=H
Roll Callhttps://le.utah.gov/mtgvotes.jsp?voteid=20442
Roll Callhttps://le.utah.gov/mtgvotes.jsp?voteid=20444

Bill Comments

feedback