UT HB0054 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-17 - House/ to Governor in EGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-17 - House/ to Governor in EGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Property Tax Exemption for Water Facilities
Title
Property Tax Exemption for Water Facilities
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-02-25 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2010-02-24 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2010-01-28 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2010-02-24 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2010-01-28 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-17 | House/ to Governor in EGOV | |
2010-03-16 | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in HCLERK | |
2010-02-26 | Bill Received from House for Enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2010-02-25 | House/ received from Senate in HSPKR | |
2010-02-25 | Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House in HSPKR | |
2010-02-25 | Senate/ 3rd reading in S3RD | |
2010-02-24 | Senate/ 2nd reading in S2ND | |
2010-02-17 | Senate/ lifted from standing committee in SSTREV | |
2010-02-16 | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL | |
2010-02-09 | House/ to Senate in SSEC | |
2010-02-09 | House/ uncircled in H3RDHB | |
2010-02-03 | House/ 3rd reading in H3RDHB | |
2010-01-28 | House/ committee report favorable in HSTREV | |
2010-01-25 | House/ to standing committee in HSTREV | |
2010-01-19 | House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print in HDOCKET | |
2010-01-04 | House/ to Printing with fiscal note in LRGC | |
2010-01-04 | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in LRGC | |
2009-12-11 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC | |
2009-11-19 | LFA/ bill assigned to staff for fiscal analysis in LRGC |