UT HB0052 | 2021 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-16 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-16 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Point of the Mountain Development Commission Act Modifications
Title
Point of the Mountain Development Commission Act Modifications
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-16 | Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing | |
2021-03-15 | House/ to Governor in Executive Branch - Governor | |
2021-03-15 | House | House/ received enrolled bill from Printing in Clerk of the House |
2021-03-15 | House | House/ enrolled bill to Printing in Clerk of the House |
2021-03-15 | House | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in Clerk of the House |
2021-03-05 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2021-03-05 | Bill Received from House for Enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2021-03-03 | House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2021-03-03 | House | House/ received from Senate in House Speaker |
2021-03-03 | House | Senate/ to House in House Speaker |
2021-03-03 | House | Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House in House Speaker |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Senate/ passed 3rd reading in Senate President |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Senate/ 3rd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Senate/ placed back on 3rd Reading Calendar in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 3rd Reading Calendar table in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar Table |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Senate/ passed 2nd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd reading in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Senate/ committee report favorable in Senate Economic Development and Workforce Services Committee |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Economic Development and Workforce Services Committee |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Economic Development and Workforce Services Committee |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2021-01-20 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate Secretary |
2021-01-20 | Senate | House/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary |
2021-01-20 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2021-01-19 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2021-01-19 | House | House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2021-01-19 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2021-01-06 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Clerk of the House |
2021-01-06 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2020-12-21 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2020-12-21 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2020-12-21 | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2020-12-21 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2020-12-21 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Counties
Department of Transportation
Economic Development
Housing
Interlocal Cooperation
Land Use
Legislative Committees and Task Forces
Legislative Operations
Legislative Organization
Municipalities
Planning and Zoning
Political Subdivisions (Local Issues)
Public Transit
Transportation
Transportation Funding
Department of Transportation
Economic Development
Housing
Interlocal Cooperation
Land Use
Legislative Committees and Task Forces
Legislative Operations
Legislative Organization
Municipalities
Planning and Zoning
Political Subdivisions (Local Issues)
Public Transit
Transportation
Transportation Funding
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
63C | 17 | 104 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
63I | 1 | 263 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |