UT HB0049S02 | 2014 | Regular Session
Note: Replaces legislation HB0049S01
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-13 - House/ filed in HFILE
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-13 - House/ filed in HFILE
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Water Rights - Change Application Amendments
Title
Water Rights - Change Application Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-11 - Senate - Senate/ circled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-06 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 60 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2014-03-06 - House - House/ floor amendment (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - House - House/ circled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - House - House/ substituted (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - House - House/ uncircled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - House - House/ circled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2014-03-06 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 60 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2014-03-06 - House - House/ floor amendment (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - House - House/ circled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - House - House/ substituted (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - House - House/ uncircled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - House - House/ circled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-13 | House | House/ filed in HFILE |
2014-03-13 | House | House/ received from Senate in HCLERK |
2014-03-13 | House | Senate/ to House in HCLERK |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Senate/ strike enacting clause in SSEC |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Senate/ circled in S2ND |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd reading in S2ND |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Senate/ Rules to 2nd Reading Calendar in S2ND |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in SINTRO |
2014-03-06 | Senate | House/ to Senate in SSEC |
2014-03-06 | Senate | House/ passed 3rd reading in SSEC |
2014-03-06 | House | House/ floor amendment in H3RDHB |
2014-03-05 | House | House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar in H3RDHB |
2014-03-05 | House | House/ 3rd Reading Calendar to Rules in HSTRUL |
2014-03-05 | House | House/ uncircled in H3RDHB |
2014-03-03 | House | House/ circled in H3RDHB |
2014-03-03 | House | House/ substituted in H3RDHB |
2014-03-03 | House | House/ uncircled in H3RDHB |
2014-03-01 | House | House/ to Printing with fiscal note in H3RDHB |
2014-02-27 | House | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in H3RDHB |
2014-02-24 | House | House/ circled in H3RDHB |
2014-02-24 | House | House/ 3rd reading in H3RDHB |
2014-02-12 | House | House/ 2nd reading in H3RDHB |
2014-02-12 | House | House/ comm rpt/ substituted in HSTNAE |
2014-02-12 | House | Bill Substituted by Standing Committee in HSTNAE |
2014-02-12 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in HSTNAE |
2014-02-12 | House | House Comm - Substitute Recommendation in HSTNAE |
2014-02-06 | House | House/ to Printing with fiscal note in HSTNAE |
2014-01-31 | House | House/ to standing committee in HSTNAE |
2014-01-27 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in HSTRUL |
2014-01-27 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL |
2014-01-22 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in HCLERK |
2014-01-10 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in LRGC | |
2014-01-10 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |
Same As/Similar To
HB0049S01 (Replaces) 2014-03-03 - House/ substituted in HSUB