UT HB0047 | 2021 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-16 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-16 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
DUI Revisions
Title
DUI Revisions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-17 - House - House Conference Committee - Final Passage (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee - Final Passage (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee - Final Passage (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-16 | Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing | |
2021-03-15 | House/ to Governor in Executive Branch - Governor | |
2021-03-15 | House | House/ received enrolled bill from Printing in Clerk of the House |
2021-03-11 | House | House/ enrolled bill to Printing in Clerk of the House |
2021-03-11 | House | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in Clerk of the House |
2021-02-23 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2021-02-23 | Bill Received from House for Enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2021-02-17 | House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2021-02-17 | House | House/ received from Senate in House Speaker |
2021-02-17 | House | Senate/ to House in House Speaker |
2021-02-17 | House | Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House in House Speaker |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Senate President |
2021-02-17 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate President |
2021-02-17 | Senate | House Conference Committee - Final Passage in Senate President |
2021-02-17 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Conference Committee | |
2021-02-17 | House Motion to Adopt Joint Conference Comm Rpt in Conference Committee | |
2021-02-17 | House/ received from Senate in Conference Committee | |
2021-02-17 | House | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in Clerk of the House |
2021-02-16 | House | Senate/ to House in Clerk of the House |
2021-02-16 | House | Senate Conference Committee - Final Passage in Clerk of the House |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Senate Motion to Adopt Joint Conference Comm Rpt in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2021-02-16 | Senate/ received from House in Conference Committee | |
2021-02-16 | Conference Committee Report in Conference Committee | |
2021-02-16 | Bill Substituted by Conference Committee from # 1 to # 2 in Conference Committee | |
2021-02-16 | House/ to Senate in Conference Committee | |
2021-02-16 | House Conference Committee Appointed Meeting Information in Conference Committee | |
2021-02-16 | House/ received from Senate in Conference Committee | |
2021-02-16 | Senate/ to House in Conference Committee | |
2021-02-16 | Senate Conference Committee Appointed Meeting Information in Conference Committee | |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Senate/ refused to recede from Senate amendments in Senate Secretary |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Senate Secretary |
2021-02-12 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate Secretary |
2021-02-12 | Senate | House/ refuse to concur with Senate amendment in Senate Secretary |
2021-02-11 | House | House/ placed on Concurrence Calendar in House Concurrence Calendar |
2021-02-11 | House | House/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House |
2021-02-11 | House | Senate/ to House with amendments in Clerk of the House |
2021-02-11 | House | Senate/ passed 3rd reading in Clerk of the House |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Senate/ floor amendment # 1 in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Senate/ uncircled in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Senate/ circled in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Senate/ 3rd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Senate/ passed 2nd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Senate/ substituted from # 0 to # 1 in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Senate/ uncircled in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Senate/ circled in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd reading in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Senate/ committee report favorable in Senate Judiciary, Law Enforcement, and Criminal Justice Committee |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Judiciary, Law Enforcement, and Criminal Justice Committee |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Judiciary, Law Enforcement, and Criminal Justice Committee |
2021-01-20 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2021-01-20 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2021-01-19 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate Secretary |
2021-01-19 | Senate | House/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary |
2021-01-19 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2021-01-19 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2021-01-19 | House | House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2021-01-19 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2021-01-19 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Clerk of the House |
2021-01-06 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2020-12-21 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2020-12-21 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Arrest and Detention
Bail\Pretrial Detention
Controlled Substances
Crimes
Department of Public Safety
Driving Under the Influence (DUI)
Health
Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice
Utah Highway Patrol
Bail\Pretrial Detention
Controlled Substances
Crimes
Department of Public Safety
Driving Under the Influence (DUI)
Health
Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice
Utah Highway Patrol