UT HB0046 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-13 - House/ filed in HFILE
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-13 - House/ filed in HFILE
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Deferred Deposit Lending and Forum Requirements
Title
Deferred Deposit Lending and Forum Requirements
Sponsors
Rep. Larry Wiley [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-02-21 - House - House Comm - Returned to Rules (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-13 | House | House/ filed in HFILE |
2014-03-13 | House | House/ strike enacting clause in HCLERK |
2014-02-21 | House | House/ 2nd reading in HSTRUL |
2014-02-21 | House | House/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules in HSTRUL |
2014-02-21 | House | House Comm - Returned to Rules in HSTEDU |
2014-01-30 | House | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in HSTEDU |
2014-01-30 | House | House/ to standing committee in HSTEDU |
2014-01-27 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL |
2014-01-22 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Printing in HCLERK |
2014-01-09 | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in LRGC | |
2014-01-07 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2014-01-07 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in LRGC | |
2014-01-07 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |