UT HB0044S02 | 2014 | Regular Session
Note: Replaces legislation HB0044S01
Note: Legislation replaced by HB0044S04
Note: Legislation replaced by HB0044S04
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-13 - Senate/ substituted in SSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-13 - Senate/ substituted in SSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Interstate Electric Transmission Lines
Title
Interstate Electric Transmission Lines
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-13 - Senate - Senate/ substituted (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - Senate - Senate/ uncircled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-11 - Senate - Senate/ circled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-11 - Senate - Senate/ floor amendment (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-21 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 50 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-02-21 - House - House/ uncircled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-21 - House - House/ circled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-21 - House - House/ substituted (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-21 - House - House/ uncircled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - House - House/ circled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-06 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-13 - Senate - Senate/ uncircled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-11 - Senate - Senate/ circled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-11 - Senate - Senate/ floor amendment (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-21 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 50 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-02-21 - House - House/ uncircled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-21 - House - House/ circled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-21 - House - House/ substituted (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-21 - House - House/ uncircled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - House - House/ circled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-06 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-13 | Senate | Senate/ substituted in SSUB |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Senate/ uncircled in S2ND |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Senate/ circled in S2ND |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Senate/ floor amendment in S2ND |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd reading in S2ND |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Senate/ Rules to 2nd Reading Calendar in S2ND |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Senate/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules in SSTRUL |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Senate Comm - Returned to Rules in SSTTPT |
2014-02-26 | Senate | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in SSTTPT |
2014-02-26 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in SSTTPT |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in SSTTPT |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in SINTRO |
2014-02-21 | Senate | House/ to Senate in SSEC |
2014-02-21 | Senate | House/ passed 3rd reading in SSEC |
2014-02-21 | House | House/ uncircled in H3RDHB |
2014-02-21 | House | House/ circled in H3RDHB |
2014-02-21 | House | House/ substituted in H3RDHB |
2014-02-21 | House | House/ uncircled in H3RDHB |
2014-02-21 | House | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in H3RDHB |
2014-02-13 | House | House/ circled in H3RDHB |
2014-02-13 | House | House/ 3rd reading in H3RDHB |
2014-02-10 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in H3RDHB |
2014-02-06 | House | House/ 2nd reading in H3RDHB |
2014-02-06 | House | House/ comm rpt/ substituted in HSTPUT |
2014-02-06 | House | Bill Substituted by Standing Committee in HSTPUT |
2014-02-06 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in HSTPUT |
2014-02-06 | House | House Comm - Substitute Recommendation in HSTPUT |
2014-01-30 | House | House/ to standing committee in HSTPUT |
2014-01-27 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL |
2014-01-22 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Printing in HCLERK |
2014-01-07 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in LRGC | |
2014-01-07 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |
Same As/Similar To
HB0044S01 (Replaces) 2014-02-21 - House/ substituted in HSUB
HB0044S04 (Replaced by) 2014-04-01 - Governor Signed in LTGOV
HB0044S04 (Replaced by) 2014-04-01 - Governor Signed in LTGOV