UT HB0043 | 2023 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 14 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-14 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 14 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-14 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Domestic Violence Modifications
Title
Domestic Violence Modifications
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-01 - House - House/ concurs with Senate amendment (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-02-28 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-02-08 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-01 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-01 - Senate - Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-01 - Senate - Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 1 to # 2 (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-01-17 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-28 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-02-08 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-01 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-01 - Senate - Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-01 - Senate - Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 1 to # 2 (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-01-17 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-14 | Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing | |
2023-03-13 | House/ to Governor in Executive Branch - Governor | |
2023-03-13 | House | House/ received enrolled bill from Printing in Clerk of the House |
2023-03-09 | House | House/ enrolled bill to Printing in Clerk of the House |
2023-03-09 | House | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in Clerk of the House |
2023-03-02 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2023-03-02 | Bill Received from House for Enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2023-03-01 | House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2023-03-01 | House | House/ received from Senate in House Speaker |
2023-03-01 | House | Senate/ to House in House Speaker |
2023-03-01 | House | Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House in House Speaker |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Senate President |
2023-03-01 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate President |
2023-03-01 | Senate | House/ concurs with Senate amendment in Senate President |
2023-02-28 | House | House/ placed on Concurrence Calendar in House Concurrence Calendar |
2023-02-28 | House | House/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House |
2023-02-28 | House | Senate/ to House with amendments in Clerk of the House |
2023-02-28 | House | Senate/ passed 3rd reading in Clerk of the House |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Senate/ 3rd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Senate/ placed back on 3rd Reading Calendar in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 3rd Reading Calendar table in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar Table |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Senate/ passed 2nd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Senate/ uncircled in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Senate/ circled in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd reading in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2023-02-02 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted/ amended in Senate Judiciary, Law Enforcement, and Criminal Justice Committee |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Judiciary, Law Enforcement, and Criminal Justice Committee |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 in Senate Judiciary, Law Enforcement, and Criminal Justice Committee |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 1 to # 2 in Senate Judiciary, Law Enforcement, and Criminal Justice Committee |
2023-01-31 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in Senate Judiciary, Law Enforcement, and Criminal Justice Committee |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Judiciary, Law Enforcement, and Criminal Justice Committee |
2023-01-18 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2023-01-18 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2023-01-17 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate Secretary |
2023-01-17 | Senate | House/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary |
2023-01-17 | House | House/ substituted from # 0 to # 1 in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2023-01-17 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2023-01-17 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2023-01-17 | House | House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2023-01-17 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2023-01-17 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Clerk of the House |
2023-01-04 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2022-12-21 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2022-12-21 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Commission on Criminal and Juvenile Justice
Crimes
Department of Public Safety
Domestic Violence
Electronic Databases
Government Operations (State Issues)
Government Records
Judges
Judicial Administration
Judicial Operations
Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice
Peace Officers
Protective Orders
Public Safety
Crimes
Department of Public Safety
Domestic Violence
Electronic Databases
Government Operations (State Issues)
Government Records
Judges
Judicial Administration
Judicial Operations
Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice
Peace Officers
Protective Orders
Public Safety
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
63I | 1 | 263 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
78B | 7 | 120 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |