UT HB0041 | 2021 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-17 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-17 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Murdered and Missing Indigenous Women and Girls Task Force
Title
Murdered and Missing Indigenous Women and Girls Task Force
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-17 | Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing | |
2021-03-16 | House/ to Governor in Executive Branch - Governor | |
2021-03-16 | House | House/ received enrolled bill from Printing in Clerk of the House |
2021-03-15 | House | House/ enrolled bill to Printing in Clerk of the House |
2021-03-15 | House | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in Clerk of the House |
2021-03-04 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2021-03-04 | Bill Received from House for Enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2021-03-03 | House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2021-03-03 | House | House/ received from Senate in House Speaker |
2021-03-03 | House | Senate/ to House in House Speaker |
2021-03-03 | House | Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House in House Speaker |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Senate/ passed 3rd reading in Senate President |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Senate/ 3rd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Senate/ placed back on 3rd Reading Calendar in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 3rd Reading Calendar table in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar Table |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Senate/ passed 2nd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd reading in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Senate/ committee report favorable in Senate Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Environment Committee |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Environment Committee |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Environment Committee |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2021-01-20 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate Secretary |
2021-01-20 | Senate | House/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary |
2021-01-20 | House | House/ substituted from # 0 to # 1 in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2021-01-20 | House | House/ uncircled in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2021-01-19 | House | House/ to Printing with fiscal note in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2021-01-19 | House | House/ circled in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2021-01-19 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2021-01-19 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2021-01-19 | House | House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2021-01-19 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2021-01-19 | House | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in Clerk of the House |
2021-01-06 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Clerk of the House |
2021-01-06 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2020-12-21 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2020-12-21 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Indian Affairs
Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice
Legislative Committees and Task Forces
Legislative Operations
Legislative Organization
Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice
Legislative Committees and Task Forces
Legislative Operations
Legislative Organization