UT HB0035 | 2022 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-23 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-23 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Economic Development Modifications
Title
Economic Development Modifications
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-14 - House - House/ concurs with Senate amendment (Y: 56 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 25 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 50 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-01-24 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-24 - House - House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 25 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 50 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-01-24 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-24 - House - House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-23 | Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing | |
2022-03-14 | House/ to Governor in Executive Branch - Governor | |
2022-03-10 | House | House/ enrolled bill to Printing in Clerk of the House |
2022-03-10 | House | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in Clerk of the House |
2022-02-16 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2022-02-16 | Bill Received from House for Enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2022-02-15 | House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2022-02-15 | House | House/ received from Senate in House Speaker |
2022-02-14 | House | Senate/ to House in House Speaker |
2022-02-14 | House | Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House in House Speaker |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Senate President |
2022-02-14 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate President |
2022-02-14 | Senate | House/ concurs with Senate amendment in Senate President |
2022-02-14 | House | House/ uncircled in House Concurrence Calendar |
2022-02-14 | House | House/ circled in House Concurrence Calendar |
2022-02-14 | House | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in House Concurrence Calendar |
2022-02-13 | House | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in House Concurrence Calendar |
2022-02-11 | House | House/ placed on Concurrence Calendar in House Concurrence Calendar |
2022-02-11 | House | House/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House |
2022-02-11 | House | Senate/ to House with amendments in Clerk of the House |
2022-02-11 | House | Senate/ passed 3rd reading in Clerk of the House |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Senate/ substituted from # 2 to # 3 in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Senate/ 3rd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Senate/ passed 2nd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Senate/ floor amendment # 1 in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd reading in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2022-02-04 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2022-02-04 | Senate | Senate/ committee report favorable in Senate Economic Development and Workforce Services Committee |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Economic Development and Workforce Services Committee |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Economic Development and Workforce Services Committee |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2022-01-31 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate Secretary |
2022-01-31 | Senate | House/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary |
2022-01-31 | House | House/ substituted from # 1 to # 2 in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2022-01-31 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2022-01-30 | House | House/ to Printing with fiscal note in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2022-01-25 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2022-01-25 | House | House/ comm rpt/ substituted in House Economic Development and Workforce Services Committee |
2022-01-24 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Economic Development and Workforce Services Committee |
2022-01-24 | House | House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 in House Economic Development and Workforce Services Committee |
2022-01-24 | House | House/ to Printing with fiscal note in House Economic Development and Workforce Services Committee |
2022-01-19 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Economic Development and Workforce Services Committee |
2022-01-18 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2022-01-18 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Clerk of the House |
2022-01-12 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2021-12-14 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2021-12-14 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Administrative Rulemaking and Procedures
Community Reinvestment Agencies
Economic Development
Governor's Office of Economic Opportunity
Income Tax
Limited Purpose Local Government Entities
New Rulemaking Authority
Political Subdivisions (Local Issues)
Revenue and Taxation
Tax Credits
Community Reinvestment Agencies
Economic Development
Governor's Office of Economic Opportunity
Income Tax
Limited Purpose Local Government Entities
New Rulemaking Authority
Political Subdivisions (Local Issues)
Revenue and Taxation
Tax Credits
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
59 | 7 | 614 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
63N | 2 | 102 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
63N | 2 | 103 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
63N | 2 | 104 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
63N | 2 | 105 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
63N | 2 | 107 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
63N | 2 | 108 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
63N | 3 | 102 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
63N | 3 | 111 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |