UT HB0032 | 2021 | General Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 22 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-02-16 - Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Energy Balancing Account Amendments

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Energy Balancing Account Amendments

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-16 Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling
2021-02-16 Bill Received from House for Enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling
2021-02-04 House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling
2021-02-04HouseHouse/ received from Senate in House Speaker
2021-02-04HouseSenate/ to House in House Speaker
2021-02-04HouseSenate/ signed by President/ returned to House in House Speaker
2021-02-04SenateSenate/ passed 3rd reading in Senate President
2021-02-04SenateSenate/ 3rd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar
2021-02-03SenateSenate/ passed 2nd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar
2021-02-03SenateSenate/ 2nd reading in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2021-01-27SenateSenate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2021-01-27SenateSenate/ committee report favorable in Senate Transportation, Public Utilities, Energy, and Technology Committee
2021-01-26SenateSenate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Transportation, Public Utilities, Energy, and Technology Committee
2021-01-26SenateSenate/ to standing committee in Senate Transportation, Public Utilities, Energy, and Technology Committee
2021-01-22SenateSenate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee
2021-01-22SenateSenate/ received from House in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate
2021-01-21SenateHouse/ to Senate in Senate Secretary
2021-01-21SenateHouse/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary
2021-01-21HouseHouse/ uncircled in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2021-01-20HouseLFA/ fiscal note publicly available in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2021-01-19HouseHouse/ circled in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2021-01-19HouseHouse/ substituted from # 0 to # 1 in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2021-01-19HouseHouse/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2021-01-19HouseHouse/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2021-01-19HouseHouse/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2021-01-19HouseHouse/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee
2021-01-06HouseHouse/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Clerk of the House
2021-01-06HouseHouse/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House
2020-12-16 Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel
2020-12-16 Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel
2020-12-16 Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel
2020-12-16 Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
54713Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Utah State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://le.utah.gov/~2021/bills/static/HB0032.html
Texthttp://le.utah.gov/~2021/bills/hbillint/HB0032.pdf
Texthttp://le.utah.gov/~2021/bills/hbillint/HB0032S01.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2021/HB0032.fn.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2021/HB0032S01.fn.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2021/HB0032.pna.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/~2021/bills/hbillint/HB0032S01_ComparedWith_HB0032.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2021/HB0032S01.pna.pdf
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?sessionid=2021GS&voteid=52&house=H
Roll Callhttps://le.utah.gov/mtgvotes.jsp?voteid=18564
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?sessionid=2021GS&voteid=231&house=S
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?sessionid=2021GS&voteid=245&house=S

Bill Comments

feedback