UT HB0030 | 2021 | General Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 25 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-03-03 - Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Tax Modifications

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Tax Modifications

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-01 - House - House/ concurs with Senate amendment (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-03 Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling
2021-03-03 Bill Received from House for Enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling
2021-03-02 House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling
2021-03-02HouseHouse/ received from Senate in House Speaker
2021-03-01HouseSenate/ to House in House Speaker
2021-03-01HouseSenate/ signed by President/ returned to House in House Speaker
2021-03-01SenateSenate/ received from House in Senate President
2021-03-01SenateHouse/ to Senate in Senate President
2021-03-01SenateHouse/ concurs with Senate amendment in Senate President
2021-02-26HouseLFA/ fiscal note publicly available in House Concurrence Calendar
2021-02-26HouseHouse/ placed on Concurrence Calendar in House Concurrence Calendar
2021-02-25HouseLFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in Clerk of the House
2021-02-25HouseSenate/ to House with amendments in Clerk of the House
2021-02-25HouseSenate/ passed 3rd reading in Clerk of the House
2021-02-25SenateSenate/ substituted from # 3 to # 4 in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar
2021-02-25SenateSenate/ uncircled in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar
2021-02-25SenateSenate/ circled in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar
2021-02-24SenateSenate/ placed back on 3rd Reading Calendar in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar
2021-02-24SenateSenate/ motion to reconsider in Senate Secretary
2021-02-24SenateHouse/ to Senate in Senate Secretary
2021-02-24HouseSenate/ recalled by Senate in Clerk of the House
2021-02-24HouseHouse/ placed on Concurrence Calendar in House Concurrence Calendar
2021-02-24HouseHouse/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House
2021-02-24HouseSenate/ to House with amendments in Clerk of the House
2021-02-24HouseSenate/ passed 3rd reading in Clerk of the House
2021-02-24SenateSenate/ 3rd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar
2021-02-24SenateSenate/ placed back on 3rd Reading Calendar in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar
2021-02-10SenateSenate/ placed on 3rd Reading Calendar table in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar Table
2021-02-10SenateSenate/ passed 2nd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar
2021-02-10SenateSenate/ substituted from # 1 to # 3 in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2021-02-10SenateSenate/ uncircled in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2021-02-04SenateSenate/ circled in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2021-02-04SenateSenate/ 2nd reading in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2021-02-02SenateSenate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2021-02-02SenateSenate/ committee report favorable in Senate Revenue and Taxation Committee
2021-02-01SenateSenate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Revenue and Taxation Committee
2021-01-27SenateSenate/ to standing committee in Senate Revenue and Taxation Committee
2021-01-25SenateSenate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee
2021-01-25SenateSenate/ received from House in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate
2021-01-22SenateHouse/ to Senate in Senate Secretary
2021-01-22SenateHouse/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary
2021-01-22HouseHouse/ substituted from # 0 to # 1 in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2021-01-22HouseHouse/ uncircled in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2021-01-19HouseHouse/ circled in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2021-01-19HouseHouse/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2021-01-19HouseHouse/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2021-01-19HouseHouse/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2021-01-19HouseHouse/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee
2021-01-19HouseHouse/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Clerk of the House
2021-01-06HouseHouse/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House
2020-12-16 Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel
2020-12-16 Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1141102Amended CodeSee Bill Text
193106Amended CodeSee Bill Text
35A8308Amended CodeSee Bill Text
35A8309Amended CodeSee Bill Text
591401Amended CodeSee Bill Text
591403Amended CodeSee Bill Text
591404Amended CodeSee Bill Text
59101007Amended CodeSee Bill Text
59101017Amended CodeSee Bill Text
59101022Amended CodeSee Bill Text
59101023Amended CodeSee Bill Text
59101028Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5910103Amended CodeSee Bill Text
59101035Amended CodeSee Bill Text
59101036Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5910114Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5910137Amended CodeSee Bill Text
59101403Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5910507Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5910514Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5910516Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5910522Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5912102Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5912103Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5912104Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5912209Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5912210Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5914212Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5921007Amended CodeSee Bill Text
592103Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5921602Amended CodeSee Bill Text
597118Amended CodeSee Bill Text
597159Amended CodeSee Bill Text
597504Amended CodeSee Bill Text
597505Amended CodeSee Bill Text
597507Amended CodeSee Bill Text
597610Amended CodeSee Bill Text
597619Amended CodeSee Bill Text
597620Amended CodeSee Bill Text
62A11328Amended CodeSee Bill Text
63G2302Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Utah State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://le.utah.gov/~2021/bills/static/HB0030.html
Texthttp://le.utah.gov/~2021/bills/hbillint/HB0030.pdf
Texthttp://le.utah.gov/~2021/bills/hbillint/HB0030S01.pdf
Texthttp://le.utah.gov/~2021/bills/hbillint/HB0030S03.pdf
Texthttp://le.utah.gov/~2021/bills/hbillint/HB0030S04.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2021/HB0030.fn.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2021/HB0030S01.fn.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2021/HB0030.pna.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/~2021/bills/hbillint/HB0030S01_ComparedWith_HB0030.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2021/HB0030S01.pna.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/~2021/bills/hbillint/HB0030S02_ComparedWith_HB0030S01.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2021/HB0030S02.pna.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/~2021/bills/hbillint/HB0030S03_ComparedWith_HB0030S02.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2021/HB0030S02.fn.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2021/HB0030S03.pna.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2021/HB0030S03.fn.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/~2021/bills/hbillint/HB0030S04_ComparedWith_HB0030S03.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2021/HB0030S04.fn.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2021/HB0030S04.pna.pdf
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?sessionid=2021GS&voteid=65&house=H
Roll Callhttps://le.utah.gov/mtgvotes.jsp?voteid=18855
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?sessionid=2021GS&voteid=398&house=S
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?sessionid=2021GS&voteid=890&house=S
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?sessionid=2021GS&voteid=987&house=S
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?sessionid=2021GS&voteid=842&house=H

Bill Comments

feedback