UT HB0029 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 26 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-26 - Governor Signed in ELTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 26 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-26 - Governor Signed in ELTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
School District Division Amendments
Title
School District Division Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-02-04 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2010-02-03 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 26 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-02-01 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2010-02-03 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 26 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-02-01 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-26 | Governor Signed in ELTGOV | |
2010-03-19 | House/ enrolled bill to Printing in HCLERK | |
2010-02-08 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in LRGCEN | |
2010-02-05 | House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2010-02-04 | Senate/ to House in HSPKR | |
2010-02-04 | Senate/ passed 3rd reading in SPRES | |
2010-02-03 | Senate/ passed 2nd reading in S3RD | |
2010-02-02 | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in S2ND | |
2010-02-01 | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in SSTEDU | |
2010-01-27 | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL | |
2010-01-26 | House/ passed 3rd reading in SSEC | |
2010-01-25 | House/ 2nd reading in H3RDHB | |
2010-01-25 | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL | |
2010-01-07 | House/ to Printing with fiscal note in HDOCKET | |
2010-01-07 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in LRGC | |
2009-12-14 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2009-12-11 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |