UT HB0024 | 2013 | Regular Session
Note: Legislation replaced by HB0024S01
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-30 - House/ substituted in HSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-30 - House/ substituted in HSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Utah Retirement System Amendments
Title
Utah Retirement System Amendments
Sponsors
Sen. Don Ipson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-30 | House | House/ substituted in HSUB |
2013-01-30 | House | House/ 3rd reading in H3RDHB |
2013-01-28 | House | House/ 2nd reading/ suspension in H3RDHB |
2013-01-28 | House | House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar in HSTRUL |
2013-01-28 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL |
2013-01-15 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in HCLERK |
2013-01-15 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in HCLERK |
2013-01-09 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in LRGC | |
2013-01-09 | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in LRGC | |
2012-12-19 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2012-12-19 | Numbered Bill Publically Distributed in LRGC | |
2012-12-11 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |
Same As/Similar To
HB0024S01 (Replaced by) 2013-04-01 - Governor Signed in ELTGOV
Subjects
Utah State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://le.utah.gov/~2013/htmdoc/hbillhtm/HB0024.htm |
Text | https://le.utah.gov/~2013/bills/hbillint/hb0024.pdf |