UT HB0022 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-02 - House/ failed in HFILE
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-02 - House/ failed in HFILE
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Inmate Health Insurance Amendments
Title
Inmate Health Insurance Amendments
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Ray [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-01-27 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-02 | House/ failed in HFILE | |
2010-02-02 | House/ 3rd reading in H3RDHB | |
2010-01-27 | House/ comm rpt/ amended in HSTLAW | |
2010-01-27 | House Comm - Amendment Recommendation in HSTLAW | |
2010-01-25 | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL | |
2010-01-07 | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in HDOCKET | |
2010-01-05 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in LRGC | |
2009-12-14 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2009-12-10 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |