UT HB0020 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 5 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-10 - Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted in SSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-10 - Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted in SSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Amendments to Health Insurance Coverage in State Contracts
Title
Amendments to Health Insurance Coverage in State Contracts
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-01-29 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-10 | Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted in SSUB | |
2010-02-09 | Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation in SSTBUS | |
2010-02-05 | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL | |
2010-02-03 | House/ to Senate in SSEC | |
2010-02-03 | House/ 3rd reading in HCON | |
2010-01-29 | House/ comm rpt/ amended/ placed on Consent Cal in HSTBUS | |
2010-01-29 | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in HSTBUS | |
2010-01-27 | House/ to standing committee in HSTBUS | |
2010-01-19 | House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print in HDOCKET | |
2010-01-04 | House/ to Printing with fiscal note in LRGC | |
2009-12-31 | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in LRGC | |
2009-12-17 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC | |
2009-11-19 | LFA/ bill assigned to staff for fiscal analysis in LRGC |