UT HB0012 | 2023 | General Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-13 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Department of Commerce Electronic Payment Fees

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Department of Commerce Electronic Payment Fees

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-02-02 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-01 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-01-23 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-01-18 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 63 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-13 Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
2023-03-13 House/ to Governor in Executive Branch - Governor
2023-03-13HouseHouse/ received enrolled bill from Printing in Clerk of the House
2023-03-09HouseHouse/ enrolled bill to Printing in Clerk of the House
2023-03-09HouseEnrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in Clerk of the House
2023-02-14 Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling
2023-02-14 Bill Received from House for Enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling
2023-02-02 House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling
2023-02-02HouseHouse/ received from Senate in House Speaker
2023-02-02HouseSenate/ to House in House Speaker
2023-02-02HouseSenate/ signed by President/ returned to House in House Speaker
2023-02-02SenateSenate/ passed 3rd reading in Senate President
2023-02-02SenateSenate/ 3rd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar
2023-02-01SenateSenate/ passed 2nd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar
2023-02-01SenateSenate/ uncircled in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2023-02-01SenateSenate/ circled in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2023-02-01SenateSenate/ 2nd reading in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2023-01-24SenateSenate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2023-01-24SenateSenate/ committee report favorable in Senate Business and Labor Committee
2023-01-23SenateSenate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Business and Labor Committee
2023-01-23SenateSenate/ to standing committee in Senate Business and Labor Committee
2023-01-19SenateSenate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee
2023-01-19SenateSenate/ received from House in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate
2023-01-18SenateHouse/ to Senate in Senate Secretary
2023-01-18SenateHouse/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary
2023-01-18HouseHouse/ substituted from # 0 to # 1 in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2023-01-18HouseHouse/ uncircled in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2023-01-18HouseHouse/ circled in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2023-01-18HouseHouse/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2023-01-18HouseHouse/ to Printing with fiscal note in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2023-01-18HouseLFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2023-01-17HouseHouse/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2023-01-17HouseHouse/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2023-01-17HouseHouse/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee
2023-01-17HouseHouse/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Clerk of the House
2023-01-04HouseHouse/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House
2022-12-16 Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel
2022-12-16 Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1312Amended CodeSee Bill Text
63J1602Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Utah State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback