UT HB0011 | 2023 | General Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-13 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Volunteer Government Workers Amendments

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Volunteer Government Workers Amendments

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-01-31 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-01-25 - Senate - Senate Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-01-25 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-01-23 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-01-18 - House - House Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-18 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-13 Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
2023-03-13 House/ to Governor in Executive Branch - Governor
2023-03-13HouseHouse/ received enrolled bill from Printing in Clerk of the House
2023-03-09HouseHouse/ enrolled bill to Printing in Clerk of the House
2023-03-09HouseEnrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in Clerk of the House
2023-02-14 Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling
2023-02-14 Bill Received from House for Enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling
2023-01-31 House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling
2023-01-31HouseHouse/ received from Senate in House Speaker
2023-01-31HouseSenate/ to House in House Speaker
2023-01-31HouseSenate/ signed by President/ returned to House in House Speaker
2023-01-31SenateSenate/ passed 3rd reading in Senate President
2023-01-31SenateSenate/ 3rd reading in Senate Consent Calendar
2023-01-26SenateSenate/ 2nd reading in Senate Consent Calendar
2023-01-26SenateSenate/ comm rpt/ placed on Consent Calendar in Senate Economic Development and Workforce Services Committee
2023-01-25SenateSenate Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation in Senate Economic Development and Workforce Services Committee
2023-01-25SenateSenate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Economic Development and Workforce Services Committee
2023-01-25SenateSenate/ to standing committee in Senate Economic Development and Workforce Services Committee
2023-01-24SenateSenate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee
2023-01-24SenateSenate/ received from House in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate
2023-01-23SenateHouse/ to Senate in Senate Secretary
2023-01-23SenateHouse/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary
2023-01-23HouseHouse/ 3rd reading in House Consent Calendar
2023-01-19HouseHouse/ 2nd reading in House Consent Calendar
2023-01-19HouseHouse/ comm rpt/ placed on Consent Calendar in House Political Subdivisions Committee
2023-01-18HouseHouse Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation in House Political Subdivisions Committee
2023-01-18HouseHouse Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Political Subdivisions Committee
2023-01-17HouseHouse/ to standing committee in House Political Subdivisions Committee
2023-01-17HouseHouse/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee
2023-01-17HouseHouse/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Clerk of the House
2023-01-04HouseHouse/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House
2022-12-16 LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Legislative Research and General Counsel
2022-12-16 LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel
2022-12-16 Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel
2022-12-13 Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
34A3113Amended CodeSee Bill Text
67202Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Utah State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback