UT HB0007 | 2021 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-04 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-04 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
National Guard, Veterans Affairs, and Legislature Base Budget
Title
National Guard, Veterans Affairs, and Legislature Base Budget
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-01-28 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-04 | Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing | |
2021-02-01 | House/ to Governor in Executive Branch - Governor | |
2021-02-01 | House | House/ received enrolled bill from Printing in Clerk of the House |
2021-01-29 | House | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in Clerk of the House |
2021-01-29 | House | House/ enrolled bill to Printing in Clerk of the House |
2021-01-29 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2021-01-29 | Bill Received from House for Enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2021-01-28 | House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2021-01-28 | House | House/ received from Senate in House Speaker |
2021-01-28 | House | Senate/ to House in House Speaker |
2021-01-28 | House | Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House in House Speaker |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in Senate President |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2021-01-27 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate Secretary |
2021-01-27 | Senate | House/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary |
2021-01-27 | House | House/ uncircled in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2021-01-22 | House | House/ circled in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2021-01-22 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2021-01-22 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2021-01-22 | House | House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2021-01-19 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2021-01-19 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Clerk of the House |
2021-01-19 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2021-01-18 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2021-01-16 | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2021-01-14 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2021-01-14 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2021-01-14 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Appropriations
Department of Veterans and Military Affairs
Government Operations (State Issues)
Legislative Operations
Public Budgeting
Utah National Guard
Veterans and Military Affairs
Department of Veterans and Military Affairs
Government Operations (State Issues)
Legislative Operations
Public Budgeting
Utah National Guard
Veterans and Military Affairs