US SR843 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on November 17 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-11-17 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6768; text: CR S6783-6784)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 17 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-11-17 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6768; text: CR S6783-6784)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A resolution expressing support for the designation of the week beginning on November 7, 2022 as "National School Psychology Week".
Title
A resolution expressing support for the designation of the week beginning on November 7, 2022 as "National School Psychology Week".
Sponsors
Sen. Alex Padilla [D-CA] | Sen. Bill Cassidy [R-LA] | Sen. Tina Smith [D-MN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-11-17 | Senate | Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6768; text: CR S6783-6784) |
Same As/Similar To
HR781 (Same As) 2021-11-09 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
HR1441 (Same As) 2022-10-21 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
SR459 (Same As) 2021-11-19 - Referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S8761)
HR1441 (Same As) 2022-10-21 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
SR459 (Same As) 2021-11-19 - Referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S8761)
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/senate-resolution/843/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/sres843/BILLS-117sres843ats.pdf |