US SR755 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2-1)
Status: Introduced on September 8 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-15 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4804; text: 09/08/2022 CR S4516-4517)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 8 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-15 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4804; text: 09/08/2022 CR S4516-4517)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A resolution recognizing September 11, 2022, as a "National Day of Service and Remembrance".
Title
A resolution recognizing September 11, 2022, as a "National Day of Service and Remembrance".
Sponsors
Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] | Sen. Bill Cassidy [R-LA] | Sen. Jack Reed [D-RI] | Sen. Jeanne Shaheen [D-NH] |
Sen. Charles Schumer [D-NY] | Sen. Chris Van Hollen [D-MD] | Sen. Angus King [I-ME] | Sen. Susan Collins [R-ME] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-15 | Senate | Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4804; text: 09/08/2022 CR S4516-4517) |
2022-09-15 | Senate | Senate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent. |
2022-09-08 | Senate | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
Same As/Similar To
HCR104 (Related) 2022-09-09 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.