US SR737 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on August 2 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-07 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4488; text: 08/02/2022 CR S3866-3867)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on August 2 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-07 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4488; text: 08/02/2022 CR S3866-3867)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A resolution designating August 10, 2022, as "Toxic Exposure Awareness Day".
Title
A resolution designating August 10, 2022, as "Toxic Exposure Awareness Day".
Sponsors
Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] | Sen. Mike Rounds [R-SD] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-07 | Senate | Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4488; text: 08/02/2022 CR S3866-3867) |
2022-09-07 | Senate | Senate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent. |
2022-08-02 | Senate | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |