US SR687 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on September 10 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-30 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: 9/10/2020 CR S5552-5553)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 10 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-30 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: 9/10/2020 CR S5552-5553)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A resolution honoring the life and legacy of Coya Knutson.
Title
A resolution honoring the life and legacy of Coya Knutson.
Sponsors
Sen. Tina Smith [D-MN] | Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-30 | Senate | Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: 9/10/2020 CR S5552-5553) |
2020-09-30 | Senate | Senate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5998) |
2020-09-10 | Senate | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
Same As/Similar To
HR1133 (Same As) 2020-09-21 - Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.