US SR676 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-8-1)
Status: Introduced on June 15 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-23 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (text: 06/15/2022 CR S2972)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 15 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-23 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (text: 06/15/2022 CR S2972)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A resolution expressing support for the designation of June 23, 2022, as "National Pell Grant Day".
Title
A resolution expressing support for the designation of June 23, 2022, as "National Pell Grant Day".
Sponsors
Sen. Patty Murray [D-WA] | Sen. Roy Blunt [R-MO] | Sen. Tammy Baldwin [D-WI] | Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] |
Sen. Cory Booker [D-NJ] | Sen. John Boozman [R-AR] | Sen. Sherrod Brown [D-OH] | Sen. Richard Burr [R-NC] |
Sen. Shelley Capito [R-WV] | Sen. Benjamin Cardin [D-MD] | Sen. Robert Casey [D-PA] | Sen. Susan Collins [R-ME] |
Sen. Tammy Duckworth [D-IL] | Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL] | Sen. Dianne Feinstein [D-CA] | Sen. Chuck Grassley [R-IA] |
Sen. Margaret Hassan [D-NH] | Sen. John Hickenlooper [D-CO] | Sen. Mazie Hirono [D-HI] | Sen. Tim Kaine [D-VA] |
Sen. Mark Kelly [D-AZ] | Sen. Angus King [I-ME] | Sen. Patrick Leahy [D-VT] | Sen. Ben Lujan [D-NM] |
Sen. Edward Markey [D-MA] | Sen. Jeff Merkley [D-OR] | Sen. Jerry Moran [R-KS] | Sen. Alex Padilla [D-CA] |
Sen. Jack Reed [D-RI] | Sen. Brian Schatz [D-HI] | Sen. Jeanne Shaheen [D-NH] | Sen. Charles Schumer [D-NY] |
Sen. Tina Smith [D-MN] | Sen. Chris Van Hollen [D-MD] | Sen. Raphael Warnock [D-GA] | Sen. Elizabeth Warren [D-MA] |
Sen. Sheldon Whitehouse [D-RI] | Sen. Roger Wicker [R-MS] | Sen. Ron Wyden [D-OR] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-23 | Senate | Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (text: 06/15/2022 CR S2972) |
2022-06-23 | Senate | Senate Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S3149-3150) |
2022-06-23 | Senate | Senate Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions discharged by Unanimous Consent. |
2022-06-15 | Senate | Referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. |
Same As/Similar To
HR1193 (Related) 2022-06-21 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.