US SR67 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-10 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and an amended preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S2395-2397; text: CR S2396-2397)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-10 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and an amended preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S2395-2397; text: CR S2396-2397)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
This resolution reaffirms the importance of the U.S.-Japan and U.S.-South Korea alliances in promoting peace, stability, and security in the Indo-Pacific region, and reaffirms the U.S. commitment to defend both Japan and South Korea. It also states the importance of deepening diplomatic and security cooperation between the three countries.
Title
A resolution expressing the sense of the Senate on the importance and vitality of the United States alliances with Japan and the Republic of Korea, and our trilateral cooperation in the pursuit of shared interests.
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Menendez [D-NJ] | Sen. Cory Gardner [R-CO] | Sen. Edward Markey [D-MA] | Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-10 | Senate | Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and an amended preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S2395-2397; text: CR S2396-2397) |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 59. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Risch without amendment and with an amended preamble. Without written report. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported with an amendment favorably. |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. (text: CR S1279-1280) |
Same As/Similar To
HR127 (Related) 2019-09-24 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
Alliances
Asia
Cultural exchanges and relations
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Foreign aid and international relief
Higher education
Human rights
International affairs
International exchange and broadcasting
Japan
Military assistance, sales, and agreements
North Korea
Sanctions
South Korea
United Nations
Women's rights
Asia
Cultural exchanges and relations
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Foreign aid and international relief
Higher education
Human rights
International affairs
International exchange and broadcasting
Japan
Military assistance, sales, and agreements
North Korea
Sanctions
South Korea
United Nations
Women's rights