US SR669 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-3)
Status: Introduced on June 9 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-07-20 - Resolution agreed to in Senate with an amendment and an amended preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S3528; text: CR S3528)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 9 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-07-20 - Resolution agreed to in Senate with an amendment and an amended preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S3528; text: CR S3528)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A resolution condemning the use of hunger as a weapon of war and recognizing the effect of conflict on global food security and famine.
Title
A resolution condemning the use of hunger as a weapon of war and recognizing the effect of conflict on global food security and famine.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Merkley [D-OR] | Sen. Todd Young [R-IN] | Sen. Cory Booker [D-NJ] | Sen. John Thune [R-SD] |
Sen. Robert Menendez [D-NJ] | Sen. James Risch [R-ID] | Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] | Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] |
Sen. Chris Van Hollen [D-MD] | Sen. Alex Padilla [D-CA] | Sen. Edward Markey [D-MA] | Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] |
Sen. Mark Kelly [D-AZ] | Sen. Sherrod Brown [D-OH] | Sen. Ron Wyden [D-OR] | Sen. Tina Smith [D-MN] |
Sen. Robert Casey [D-PA] | Sen. Michael Bennet [D-CO] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-20 | Senate | Resolution agreed to in Senate with an amendment and an amended preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S3528; text: CR S3528) |
2022-07-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 434. |
2022-07-11 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Menendez with an amendment in the nature of a substitute and with an amended preamble. Without written report. |
2022-06-23 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2022-06-09 | Senate | Referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. (text: CR S2897) |
Same As/Similar To
HR922 (Related) 2022-12-01 - Pursuant to section 5 of H. Res. 1499, and the motion offered by Mr. Hoyer, the following bills passed under suspension of the rules: H.R. 4601, as amended; H.R. 4772, as amended; H.R. 4899; H.R. 5943, as amended; H.R. 7158, as amended; H.R. 8203; H.R. 9308; and S. 3825; and the following resolutions were agreed to under suspension of the rules: H. Res. 744, as amended; and H. Res. 922, as amended. (consideration: CR H8696-8700; text: CR H8699)