US SR654 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on July 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-21 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4359; text: CR S4356)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-21 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4359; text: CR S4356)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
This resolution designates July 25, 2020, as National Day of the American Cowboy.
Title
A resolution designating July 25, 2020, as "National Day of the American Cowboy".
Sponsors
Sen. Michael Enzi [R-WY] | Sen. John Barrasso [R-WY] | Sen. Jon Tester [D-MT] | Sen. Catherine Cortez Masto [D-NV] |
Sen. Jeff Merkley [D-OR] | Sen. James Inhofe [R-OK] | Sen. Mike Rounds [R-SD] | Sen. John Hoeven [R-ND] |
Sen. Mike Crapo [R-ID] | Sen. Michael Bennet [D-CO] | Sen. Tom Udall [D-NM] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-21 | Senate | Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4359; text: CR S4356) |
Same As/Similar To
SR265 (Related) 2019-07-23 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR 6/26/2019 S4579)
Subjects
Arts, culture, religion
Commemorative events and holidays
Migrant, seasonal, agricultural labor
U.S. history
Commemorative events and holidays
Migrant, seasonal, agricultural labor
U.S. history
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-resolution/654/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/sres654/BILLS-116sres654ats.pdf |