US SR627 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on May 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-10 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S2407; text: CR S2422)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-10 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S2407; text: CR S2422)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A resolution designating May 6, 2022, as "United States Foreign Service Day" in recognition of the men and women who have served, or are presently serving, in the Foreign Service of the United States, and honoring the members of the Foreign Service who have given their lives in the line of duty.
Title
A resolution designating May 6, 2022, as "United States Foreign Service Day" in recognition of the men and women who have served, or are presently serving, in the Foreign Service of the United States, and honoring the members of the Foreign Service who have given their lives in the line of duty.
Sponsors
Sen. Dan Sullivan [R-AK] | Sen. Chris Van Hollen [D-MD] | Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL] | Sen. Jeanne Shaheen [D-NH] |
Sen. Tim Kaine [D-VA] | Sen. Jeff Merkley [D-OR] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-10 | Senate | Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S2407; text: CR S2422) |
Same As/Similar To
SR202 (Related) 2021-08-09 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: 4/29/2021 CR S2370)
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/senate-resolution/627/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/sres627/BILLS-117sres627ats.pdf |