US SR596 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 15-2)
Status: Introduced on May 21 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-06-25 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (text: 05/21/2020 CR S2606-2607)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A resolution expressing the sense of the Senate that the Hong Kong national security law proposed by the Government of the People's Republic of China would violate the obligations of that government under the 1984 Sino-British Joint Declaration and the Hong Kong Basic Law and calling upon all free nations of the world to stand with the people of Hong Kong. This resolution designates the Hong Kong national security law proposed by China as a violation of China's international obligations. The resolution calls on the United States to use all diplomatic means available to dissuade China from passing the law and rally free nations to stand with the people of Hong Kong.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A resolution expressing the sense of the Senate that the Hong Kong national security law proposed by the Government of the People's Republic of China would violate the obligations of that government under the 1984 Sino-British Joint Declaration and the Hong Kong Basic Law and calling upon all free nations of the world to stand with the people of Hong Kong.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-25SenateResolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (text: 05/21/2020 CR S2606-2607)
2020-06-25SenateSenate Committee on Foreign Relations discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S3285-3289)
2020-05-21SenateReferred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.

Same As/Similar To

HR974 (Same As) 2020-06-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Asia, the Pacific and Nonproliferation.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback