US SR562 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Introduced on June 28 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-11-29 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 700.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 28 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-11-29 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 700.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A resolution expressing the sense of the Senate that the Treaty on the Non-Proliferation of Nuclear Weapons (NPT) continues to make an invaluable contribution to United States and international security, 50 years after it opened for signature on July 1, 1968.
Title
A resolution expressing the sense of the Senate that the Treaty on the Non-Proliferation of Nuclear Weapons (NPT) continues to make an invaluable contribution to United States and international security, 50 years after it opened for signature on July 1, 1968.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Merkley [D-OR] | Sen. Kirsten Gillibrand [D-NY] | Sen. Dianne Feinstein [D-CA] | Sen. Elizabeth Warren [D-MA] |
Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL] | Sen. Tina Smith [D-MN] | Sen. Edward Markey [D-MA] | Sen. Sherrod Brown [D-OH] |
Sen. Rand Paul [R-KY] | Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] | Sen. Benjamin Cardin [D-MD] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-11-29 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 700. |
2018-11-29 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Corker with an amendment in the nature of a substitute and with an amended preamble. Without written report. |
2018-11-28 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported with amendments favorably. |
2018-06-28 | Senate | Referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. (text of measure as introduced: CR S4743) |
Subjects
Alliances
Arms control and nonproliferation
Asia
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
International affairs
International law and treaties
International organizations and cooperation
Iran
Middle East
Military operations and strategy
North Korea
Nuclear weapons
Russia
Arms control and nonproliferation
Asia
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
International affairs
International law and treaties
International organizations and cooperation
Iran
Middle East
Military operations and strategy
North Korea
Nuclear weapons
Russia