US SR543 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on September 11 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-09-17 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 11 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-09-17 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Designates November 1, 2014, as National Bison Day.
Title
A resolution designating November 1, 2014, as National Bison Day.
Sponsors
Sen. Michael Enzi [R-WY] | Sen. Tammy Baldwin [D-WI] | Sen. Michael Bennet [D-CO] | Sen. John Cornyn [R-TX] |
Sen. Joe Donnelly [D-IN] | Sen. Dianne Feinstein [D-CA] | Sen. Kirsten Gillibrand [D-NY] | Sen. Orrin Hatch [R-UT] |
Sen. Heidi Heitkamp [D-ND] | Sen. John Hoeven [R-ND] | Sen. James Inhofe [R-OK] | Sen. Mike Johanns [R-NE] |
Sen. Tim Johnson [D-SD] | Sen. Mike Lee [R-UT] | Sen. Edward Markey [D-MA] | Sen. Jerry Moran [R-KS] |
Sen. Rob Portman [R-OH] | Sen. Pat Roberts [R-KS] | Sen. Charles Schumer [D-NY] | Sen. John Thune [R-SD] |
Sen. Sheldon Whitehouse [D-RI] | Sen. Roger Wicker [R-MS] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-17 | Senate | Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. |
2014-09-17 | Senate | Senate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5725) |
2014-09-11 | Senate | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text of measure as introduced: CR S5566) |
Same As/Similar To
SR254 (Related) 2013-10-29 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent.