US SR542 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 12 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Resolution agreed to in Senate with an amendment and an amended preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S3022-3024; text: CR S3023-3024)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 12 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Resolution agreed to in Senate with an amendment and an amended preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S3022-3024; text: CR S3023-3024)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
This resolution commemorates the 75th anniversary of the liberation of the Dachau concentration camp during World War II. The resolution recognizes the military units responsible for the liberation of individuals imprisoned at Dachau and calls on the people of the United States to remember the lives lost during the Holocaust.
Title
A resolution commemorating the 75th anniversary of the liberation of the Dachau concentration camp during World War II.
Sponsors
Sen. Cory Gardner [R-CO] | Sen. Kyrsten Sinema [I-AZ] | Sen. Martha McSally [R-AZ] | Sen. Michael Bennet [D-CO] |
Sen. James Inhofe [R-OK] | Sen. Benjamin Cardin [D-MD] | Sen. Jacky Rosen [D-NV] | Sen. Marsha Blackburn [R-TN] |
Sen. Kevin Cramer [R-ND] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-16 | Senate | Resolution agreed to in Senate with an amendment and an amended preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S3022-3024; text: CR S3023-3024) |
2020-06-03 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 473. |
2020-06-03 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Risch with an amendment in the nature of a substitute and with an amended preamble. Without written report. |
2020-05-21 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. (text: CR S1744) |
Subjects
Commemorative events and holidays
Conflicts and wars
Congressional tributes
Europe
Germany
International affairs
Military history
Military personnel and dependents
War crimes, genocide, crimes against humanity
Conflicts and wars
Congressional tributes
Europe
Germany
International affairs
Military history
Military personnel and dependents
War crimes, genocide, crimes against humanity