US SR538 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 10 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-10 - Referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration. (text: CR S1674)
Pending: Senate Rules And Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A resolution authorizing the use of the atrium in the Philip A. Hart Senate Office Building for the National Prescription Drug Take Back Day, a semiannual event for the Drug Enforcement Administration. This resolution authorizes the use of the atrium in the Philip A. Hart Senate Office Building on April 22, 2020, for the National Prescription Drug Take Back Day, a semiannual event of the Drug Enforcement Administration.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A resolution authorizing the use of the atrium in the Philip A. Hart Senate Office Building for the National Prescription Drug Take Back Day, a semiannual event for the Drug Enforcement Administration.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-10SenateReferred to the Committee on Rules and Administration. (text: CR S1674)

Same As/Similar To

SR158 (Related) 2019-04-10 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2392; text: CR S2391)
SR359 (Related) 2019-10-16 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5853; text: CR S5851)

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback