US SR53 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-07 - Referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration. (text of measure as introduced: CR S869)
Pending: Senate Rules And Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-07 - Referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration. (text of measure as introduced: CR S869)
Pending: Senate Rules And Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An original resolution authorizing expenditures by the Committee on Armed Services. Authorizes expenditures by the Senate Committee on Armed Services from March 1, 2017, through February 28, 2019. Limits expenses of such committee to specified amounts from: (1) March 1, 2017, through September 30, 2017, (2) October 1, 2017, through September 30, 2018, and (3) October 1, 2018, through February 28, 2019.
Title
An original resolution authorizing expenditures by the Committee on Armed Services.
Sponsors
Sen. John McCain [R-AZ] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-07 | Senate | Referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration. (text of measure as introduced: CR S869) |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Committee on Armed Services. Original measure reported to Senate by Senator McCain. Without written report. |
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/senate-resolution/53/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/sres53/BILLS-115sres53is.pdf |