US SR525 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 2 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-06-16 - Resolution agreed to in Senate with amendments and an amended preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S3017-3019; text: CR S3018-3019)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A resolution expressing the sense of the Senate that the United States should continue to support the people of Nicaragua in their peaceful efforts to promote the restoration of democracy and the defense of human rights, and use the tools under United States law to increase political and economic pressure on the government of Daniel Ortega. This resolution calls on Nicaragua to release all political prisoners and cease all acts of repression against dissenting voices, encourages efforts to advance electoral reforms in Nicaragua, and urges Nicaragua to implement measures to limit the spread of COVID-19 (i.e., coronavirus disease 2019) in the country. It also exhorts the U.S. government to investigate and hold accountable those responsible for the death of U.S. citizen Eddy Montes, who was shot and killed while in the custody of Nicaraguan police.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A resolution expressing the sense of the Senate that the United States should continue to support the people of Nicaragua in their peaceful efforts to promote the restoration of democracy and the defense of human rights, and use the tools under United States law to increase political and economic pressure on the government of Daniel Ortega.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-16SenateResolution agreed to in Senate with amendments and an amended preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S3017-3019; text: CR S3018-3019)
2020-06-03SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 471.
2020-06-03SenateCommittee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Risch with amendments and with an amended preamble. Without written report.
2020-05-21SenateCommittee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported with amendments favorably.
2020-03-02SenateReferred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. (text: CR S1259-1260)

Same As/Similar To

HR754 (Related) 2020-03-09 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback