US SR525 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 2 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Resolution agreed to in Senate with amendments and an amended preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S3017-3019; text: CR S3018-3019)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Resolution agreed to in Senate with amendments and an amended preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S3017-3019; text: CR S3018-3019)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
This resolution calls on Nicaragua to release all political prisoners and cease all acts of repression against dissenting voices, encourages efforts to advance electoral reforms in Nicaragua, and urges Nicaragua to implement measures to limit the spread of COVID-19 (i.e., coronavirus disease 2019) in the country. It also exhorts the U.S. government to investigate and hold accountable those responsible for the death of U.S. citizen Eddy Montes, who was shot and killed while in the custody of Nicaraguan police.
Title
A resolution expressing the sense of the Senate that the United States should continue to support the people of Nicaragua in their peaceful efforts to promote the restoration of democracy and the defense of human rights, and use the tools under United States law to increase political and economic pressure on the government of Daniel Ortega.
Sponsors
Sen. Ted Cruz [R-TX] | Sen. Robert Menendez [D-NJ] | Sen. Marco Rubio [R-FL] | Sen. Christopher Murphy [D-CT] |
Sen. David Perdue [R-GA] | Sen. Benjamin Cardin [D-MD] | Sen. Tim Kaine [D-VA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-16 | Senate | Resolution agreed to in Senate with amendments and an amended preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S3017-3019; text: CR S3018-3019) |
2020-06-03 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 471. |
2020-06-03 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Risch with amendments and with an amended preamble. Without written report. |
2020-05-21 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported with amendments favorably. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. (text: CR S1259-1260) |
Same As/Similar To
HR754 (Related) 2020-03-09 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
Cardiovascular and respiratory health
Crime victims
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Detention of persons
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Foreign loans and debt
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Health promotion and preventive care
Human rights
Infectious and parasitic diseases
International affairs
International organizations and cooperation
Latin America
News media and reporting
Nicaragua
Protest and dissent
Rule of law and government transparency
Sanctions
Sovereignty, recognition, national governance and status
Crime victims
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Detention of persons
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Foreign loans and debt
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Health promotion and preventive care
Human rights
Infectious and parasitic diseases
International affairs
International organizations and cooperation
Latin America
News media and reporting
Nicaragua
Protest and dissent
Rule of law and government transparency
Sanctions
Sovereignty, recognition, national governance and status